EP3978288 - ELECTRIC VEHICLE, AUTOMATIC DRIVING METHOD AND EQUIPMENT, AUTOMATIC FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Ta-peng Floor 12-3, No. 1, Xiang 31, Lane 228 Section 2 Xiwan Road Xizhi District New Taipei City, Taiwan 22179 / TW | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Fiussello, Francesco Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino (TO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 20813593.9 | 29.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020CN93443 | Priority number, date | CN201910454297 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910454297 | CN201920785786U | 29.05.2019 Original published format: CN 201920785786 U | CN202010448097 | 25.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010448097 | CN202020891213U | 25.05.2020 Original published format: CN 202020891213 U | [2022/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239099 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978288 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60K7/00, B60L15/20, B60G17/02, B60B35/10, B60B35/12, G06Q10/08, B60P7/13, B60B19/12, B60G11/14, B60G17/0165, B60G17/0195, B60G3/06, B60K17/356, G06Q10/083, G06Q50/28 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
G06Q10/083 (EP);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60B19/12 (EP);
B60B35/10 (EP);
B60B35/12 (EP);
B60G11/14 (EP);
B60G17/0165 (EP);
B60G17/0195 (EP);
B60G17/021 (EP);
B60G3/06 (EP);
B60K17/356 (EP);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60P7/13 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
B60B35/1045 (EP);
B60G2200/142 (EP);
B60G2202/12 (EP);
B60G2300/40 (EP);
B60G2300/50 (EP);
B60G2400/204 (EP);
B60G2400/821 (EP);
B60G2500/30 (EP);
B60G2800/162 (EP);
B60K2007/0046 (EP);
B60K2007/0061 (EP);
B60K2007/0092 (EP);
B60L2240/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | B60K7/00, B60L15/20, B60G17/02, B60B35/10, B60B35/12, G06Q10/08, B60P7/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG, AUTOMATISCHES FAHRVERFAHREN UND AUSRÜSTUNG, AUTOMATISCHES FRACHTTRANSPORTVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2022/14] | English: | ELECTRIC VEHICLE, AUTOMATIC DRIVING METHOD AND EQUIPMENT, AUTOMATIC FREIGHT TRANSPORTATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2022/14] | French: | VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE CONDUITE AUTOMATIQUE, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE FRET AUTOMATIQUE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2021 | Translation filed | 25.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004129491 (BEAN ANDREW J [US], et al); | [XYI]US2006216966 (SELEK ALI S [TR]); | [YA]EP2251211 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [XYI]DE102013004951 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [XYI]US2017174263 (THOMPSON ALISTAIR [GB], et al); | [A]US2017210192 (REYBROUCK KOENRAAD GERALD RIJKAARD LODE [BE], et al); | [A]US2019152376 (SCHWARTZ WILLIAM [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP4222954B ; | [A]CN201890265U (QINHUANGDAO TIANYE TOLIAN HEAVY INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [Y]CN104085362 (ZHEJIANG GEELY HOLODING GROUP, et al); | [X]CN105172935 (NEW ZEALAND INVEST AND TRADE CT LTD); | [X]CN205523412U (UNIV SOUTHWEST); | [X]US2017174263 (THOMPSON ALISTAIR [GB], et al); | [Y]US2017174263 (THOMPSON ALISTAIR [GB], et al); | [X]CN106938677 (UNIV ZHEJIANG A&F); | [PX]CN110143127 (ZHANG DAPENG); | [PX]CN209870097U (ZHANG DAPENG) |