EP3965512 - UPLINK SCHEDULING METHOD AND DEVICE, NETWORK DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR, IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Hai Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20813637.4 | 09.05.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN89338 | Priority number, date | CN201910470190 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910470190 | [2022/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020238586 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965512 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965512 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L1/18, // H04W74/08 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04W72/21 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H04W72/12, // H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UPLINK-PLANUNG, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/10] | English: | UPLINK SCHEDULING METHOD AND DEVICE, NETWORK DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PLANIFICATION DE LIAISON MONTANTE, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU, ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | Translation filed | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 18.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | IE | 09.05.2023 | LU | 09.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | FR | 05.06.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
IE | 09.05.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018176847 (FASIL ABDUL LATHEEF [IN], et al); | [A]WO2019029747 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | EP3668190 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) | International search | [A]WO2016190711 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN108476539 (RESEARCH & BUSINESS FOUND SUNGKYUNKWAN UNIV); | [A]CN109392061 (ZTE CORP); |