Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2020241397 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2021 | A1 | JP6890732B | 18.06.2021 | B2 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP19864 | 20.05.2020 | JP2019099017 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4187572 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP19864 | 20.05.2020 | EP20813702 | 20.05.2020 | JP2019099017 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3979292 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2022 | A4 | EP3979292 | 06.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP19864 | 20.05.2020 | JP2019099017 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020241397 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019099017 | 28.05.2019 | Type | Divisional application | EP4187572 |