EP3978140 - ELECTROSTATIC SPRAY DEVICE, CARTRIDGE, AND COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Shinji c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20815286.8 | 22.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020JP20413 | Priority number, date | JP20190103334 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019103334 | [2022/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020241526 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978140 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/025, B05B5/053, B05B5/16, B05B9/047, B05B9/08, D01D5/00, A45D34/04, A61M35/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B05B5/1691 (EP,US);
B05B5/035 (US);
A45D34/04 (EP);
B05B5/0533 (US);
B05B5/0535 (EP,US);
B05B9/047 (EP);
B05B9/0866 (EP);
D01D5/0061 (EP);
A45D2200/057 (EP);
A61M35/003 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | B05B5/025, B05B5/053 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHE SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG, KARTUSCHE UND DECKEL | [2022/14] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC SPRAY DEVICE, CARTRIDGE, AND COVER | [2022/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PULVÉRISATION ÉLECTROSTATIQUE, CARTOUCHE ET COUVERCLE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2021 | Translation filed | 16.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9115673 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]JP2005518278 ; | [A]JP2005288212 (RANSBURG IND KK); | [Y]US2006064892 (MATSUI YASUNORI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007521941 ; | [A]JP2009039608 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP4415014B ; | [A]JP2013094719 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2014534900 ; | [Y]EP2974749 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP6196223B ; | [Y]US2019153623 (SUGAWARA HIROKATSU [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2005518278 ; | [A]JP2005288212 (RANSBURG IND KK); | [A]JP2007521941 ; | [A]JP2009039608 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2013094719 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2014534900 | by applicant | JP2007521941 |