EP3975845 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MINIMIZING COGNITIVE DECLINE USING AUGMENTED REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERERA, Bodiyabaduge, Dimithri Joseph c/o ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 02 /
MATTHEWS, Lisa c/o ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 03 /
DONKER, Clare c/o ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 04 /
DASSOS, Peter c/o ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 05 /
SPINK, Corey, Anthony c/o ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 06 /
SAUNDERS, Francis, Eric c/o ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20815464.1 | 28.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020IB55081 | Priority number, date | US201962855457P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855457 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020240470 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975845 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/16, G06F17/00, A61M21/00, G06T19/00, G01C21/34, G06F3/0346, G06F3/01, A61B5/00, A61B5/024, A61B5/0531, A61B5/11, G01C21/36 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,KR);
G06F3/012 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/4088 (EP,KR);
A61M21/00 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,KR);
A61B5/024 (EP,KR);
A61B5/0531 (EP,AU,KR);
A61B5/1103 (EP);
A61B5/165 (AU);
A61B5/4064 (EP,KR);
A61B5/6803 (AU,KR);
A61B5/6814 (EP);
A61B5/7275 (EP,KR);
A61B5/7282 (EP);
A61B5/743 (EP,KR);
B60K35/28 (AU);
G01C21/365 (EP,AU,KR,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06T19/006 (EP,AU,KR);
G06T7/20 (US);
A61B2505/07 (EP);
A61B2505/09 (EP,KR);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,AU,KR);
A61B2562/0233 (EP);
A61B5/02405 (AU);
A61B5/168 (EP);
A61M2021/0027 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A61M2021/005 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A61M2205/332 (EP);
A61M2205/3375 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/507 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/80 (EP,KR);
A61M2209/088 (EP,US);
A61M2230/04 (EP);
A61M2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2230/63 (EP,US);
A61M2230/65 (EP,US);
B60K2360/177 (AU);
G02B2027/0138 (US);
G02B2027/014 (US);
G02B2027/0178 (US);
G02B27/017 (AU);
G02B27/0179 (AU);
G02B27/0955 (AU);
G06F2203/011 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | A61B5/16, G06F17/00, A61M21/00, G06T19/00, G01C21/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG DER KOGNITIVEN ABNAHME DURCH ERWEITERTE REALITÄT | [2022/14] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MINIMIZING COGNITIVE DECLINE USING AUGMENTED REALITY | [2022/14] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MINIMISER LE DÉCLIN COGNITIF À L'AIDE DE LA RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 07.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012134543 (FEDOROVSKAYA ELENA A [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0 23] - [0079]; figures 1-9 *[I] 2-10,15; | [XI]US2018004286 (CHEN RUXIN [US]) [X] 1-8,10,14,15 * paragraphs [[27]] - [[142]]; figures 1-13 * [I] 9 | International search | [X]US2013009993 (HORSEMAN SAMANTHA J [SA]) [X] 1-89 * Abstract, para 0065, 0068-0071, 0075, 0088, 0093, 0106, 0107, 0108, 0119, 0163, 0165,0166,0184,0200,0204. *; | [A]US2014104059 (TRAN BAO [US]) [A] 0 * Whole document. *; | [A]US8831278 (FEDOROVSKAYA ELENA A [US], et al) [A] 0 * Whole document. *; | [X]US9030495 (MCCULLOCH DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-89 * Abstract, lines 51 to 62 column 2, lines 46 to 60 column 3, lines 11 to 54 column 4, lines 8 to 54 column 5, lines 12 to 25 column 6, lines 33 to 44 column 6, lines 19 to 67 column 7, lines 21 to 41 column 9, lines 2 to 34 column 10, line 49 column 12 to line 30 column 13, fig 2, 3B. *; | [A]WO2017004695 (JONES FRANK [CA], et al) [A] 0* Whole document. * |