EP3968170 - SMART DEVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS, NETWORK DEVICE, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jun ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | WBH Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Müllerstraße 40 80469 München / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20815545.7 | 22.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020CN91863 | Priority number, date | CN201910458834 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910458834 | [2022/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020238801 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968170 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, H04L67/133, H04L69/324, G06F13/38 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP);
G06F13/4282 (CN);
H04L67/08 (EP);
H04L67/133 (EP);
H04L69/324 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | G06F13/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER INTELLIGENTEN VORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/11] | English: | SMART DEVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS, NETWORK DEVICE, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE DISPOSITIF INTELLIGENT, DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | Translation filed | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2013332605 (KOZLOWSKI JOSEPH [US], et al); | [XY]US2016378509 (VENKATASUBBA KARTHIK [IN], et al); | [Y]EP3255527 (QUANTA COMP INC [TW]); | [X]US2018293197 (GROBELNY NICHOLAS D [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2009019278 (SHAH HEMAL V [US], et al); | [X]US2013332605 (KOZLOWSKI JOSEPH [US], et al); | [X]US2014090051 (BRUNDRIDGE MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [X]US2016378509 (VENKATASUBBA KARTHIK [IN], et al); | [A]CN107070726 (ZHENGZHOU YUNHAI INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109117402 (INVENTEC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) |