Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12101715 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2024 | B2 | US2023199639 | 22.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016949536 | 02.11.2020 | US202318168040 | 13.02.2023 | US202062967305 | 29.01.2020 | US201962952900 | 23.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118433803 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016949536 | 02.11.2020 | US202062967305 | 29.01.2020 | CN202080087575 | 03.11.2020 | WO2020US70739 | 03.11.2020 | US201962952900 | 23.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114830728B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | B | CN114830728 | 29.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016949536 | 02.11.2020 | US202062967305 | 29.01.2020 | WO2020US70739 | 03.11.2020 | US201962952900 | 23.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4082243 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016949536 | 02.11.2020 | US202062967305 | 29.01.2020 | WO2020US70739 | 03.11.2020 | US201962952900 | 23.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021134089 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016949536 | 02.11.2020 | US202062967305 | 29.01.2020 | US201962952900 | 23.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11606746 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | B2 | US2021195512 | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016949536 | 02.11.2020 | US202062967305 | 29.01.2020 | US201962952900 | 23.12.2019 |