EP4054346 - FEED OR FEED SUPPLEMENT FOR LIVESTOCK ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huddle Corp 2 Impasse Thérèse Bertrand Fontaine 44300 Nantes / FR | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL HARRAK, Abdeslam 3 Rue du Vignoble 57380 Faulquemont / FR | 02 /
CRETEL, César Adrien Claud, René 31 rue Steffen 92600 Asnieres / FR | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20816290.9 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020FR52040 | Priority number, date | FR20190012528 | 07.11.2019 Original published format: FR 1912528 | [2022/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021089969 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054346 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4054346 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23K20/105, A23K20/147, A23K20/158, A23K20/163, A23K20/24, A23K20/28, A23K40/30, A23K50/80 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
A23K40/30 (EP);
A23K20/105 (EP);
A23K20/147 (EP);
A23K20/158 (EP);
A23K20/163 (EP);
A23K20/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 23.05.2022 | Title | German: | FUTTER- ODER FUTTERZUSATZ FÜR NUTZVIEH | [2022/37] | English: | FEED OR FEED SUPPLEMENT FOR LIVESTOCK ANIMALS | [2022/37] | French: | ALIMENT OU COMPLÉMENT ALIMENTAIRE POUR ANIMAUX D'ÉLEVAGE | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/32] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005158396 (KRAECHTER HANS-UDO [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0131]; claims 25-30 *; | [A]US2006292280 (SOPER JON C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; claim - *; | [IA]WO2008037578 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [I] 14,15 * example 1 * [A] 1-13; | [ID]EP1696736 (INVE TECHNOLOGIES N V [BE]) [ID] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011052680 (HENDRICKSON WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042]; claim - *; | [A]US2011117180 (YAN CUIE [CA], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0029]; claim - *; | [A]US2013202740 (GIVEN JR PETER S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [I]US2018325827 (WOOSTER TIMOTHY JAMES [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * example 3 *; | [A]US2019254302 (ABBASPOURRAD ALIREZA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* example 1 * | by applicant | EP1696736 |