EP4100652 - GARDEN PUMP WITH THERMOSENSITIVE LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUSQVARNA AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOTZ, Boris Lehle 26 89075 Ulm / DE | 02 /
DRÖSSLER, Christian Erich-Kästner-Ring 20 89173 Lonsee / DE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Finkele, Rolf Gardena Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Straße 40 89079 Ulm / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 20817429.2 | 09.12.2020 | [2022/50] | WO2020EP85290 | Priority number, date | EP20200155779 | 06.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20155779 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155978 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100652 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4100652 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/02, F04D29/40, F04D29/70, B33Y80/00 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
F04D29/026 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
F04D29/406 (EP);
F04D29/708 (EP);
F05D2300/502 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARTENPUMPE MIT WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHER AUSKLEIDUNG | [2023/40] | English: | GARDEN PUMP WITH THERMOSENSITIVE LINER | [2022/50] | French: | POMPE DE JARDIN AYANT UN REVÊTEMENT THERMOSENSIBLE | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/50] | GARTENPUMPE MIT THERMOSENSITIVER AUSKLEIDUNG | ||
Former [2022/50] | POMPE DE JARDIN À CHEMISE THERMOSENSIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | MC | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | IT | 09.12.2023 | LU | 09.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
PL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SK | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
IT | 09.12.2023 | ||
LU | 09.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
PT | 08.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
PL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SK | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
IT | 09.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
PT | 08.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [IAY]FR2123931 (SPECK PUMPEN DANIEL SPEC) [I] 8,9 * page 4, line 13 - line 21 * * figure 1 * [A] 10 [Y] 1-7; | [IY]JPS4943629U (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.) [I] 8-10 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-7; | [IY]DE102013013543 (WILO SE [DE]) [I] 8-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-7; | [IY]KR20180002487U (PARK IL YOUNG) [I] 8-10 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 1-7; | [IAY]CN110107540 (RUIQU FUZHOU ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD) [I] 8,9 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 10 [Y] 1-7; | [A]JP3222767U (UNITIKA LTD.) [A] 1-10* figure 1 * | by applicant | FR2123931 | DE102013013543 | KR20180002487 |