EP4061692 - MOTORCYCLE WITH WIRELESS RECHARGE SYSTEM FOR RECHARGING ELECTRICALLY POWERED DEVICES PROVIDED IN MOTORCYCLE HELMETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piaggio & C. S.P.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera Pisa / IT | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTUCCI, Mario c/o Piaggio & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (PI) / IT | 02 /
SACCHI, Luca c/o Piaggio & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (PI) / IT | 03 /
BARACCHINO, Luigi c/o Piaggio & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (PI) / IT | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20817497.9 | 16.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020IB60752 | Priority number, date | IT20190021696 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: IT201900021696 | [2022/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021099911 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061692 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62J7/02, A42B3/00, B62K19/00, B62K19/46, H02J50/00, H02J50/10, H02J7/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B62J7/02 (EP,US);
B62K19/46 (EP,US);
A42B3/006 (EP,US);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | MOTORRAD MIT EINEM DRAHTLOSEN WIEDERAUFLADESYSTEM ZUM WIEDERAUFLADEN ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENER VORRICHTUNGEN BEI MOTORRADHELMEN | [2022/39] | English: | MOTORCYCLE WITH WIRELESS RECHARGE SYSTEM FOR RECHARGING ELECTRICALLY POWERED DEVICES PROVIDED IN MOTORCYCLE HELMETS | [2022/39] | French: | MOTOCYCLETTE DOTÉE DE SYSTÈME DE RECHARGE SANS FIL POUR RECHARGER DES DISPOSITIFS ALIMENTÉS ÉLECTRIQUEMENT DISPOSÉS DANS DES CASQUES DE MOTO | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH08331766 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [YA]JP2014187782 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]US2015367733 (PEEL RONALD B [US], et al); | [Y]US2016226299 (NAM ISAAC [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20170036478 (AMOGREENTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20170092055 (AMOGREENTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2018212448 (LEE PING-LUNG [TW], et al) |