EP3981657 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT STRUCTURE OF BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HL Mando Corporation 32 Hamanho-gil Poseung-eup Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states Mando Corporation 32 Hamanho-gil Poseung-eup Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggi-do 17962 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Minseong Ieui-dong, KwangkyoYeok Chamnuri forest) 504ho, 7006dong, 55, Daehak 3-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16225 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sang Woo 1602ho, 701dong, 16, Imae-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13565 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Seungcho Dasan-dong, Namyang IJoeunjip)102ho, 723dong, 22 Migeum-ro 57beon-gil Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12253 / KR | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20817979.6 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020KR07418 | Priority number, date | KR20190067246 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190067246 | KR20190067247 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190067247 | KR20190067248 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190067248 | [2022/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020246865 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981657 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/74, B60T8/172, B60T8/171, H02P27/06, B60T8/34 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B60T8/885 (EP,US);
B60T8/17 (KR);
B60T13/74 (CN,KR,US);
B60T8/92 (US);
B60R16/02 (KR);
B60T13/745 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (CN);
B60T17/22 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP);
B60T8/171 (KR);
B60T8/172 (KR);
B60T8/34 (EP);
B60T8/343 (EP);
B60T8/368 (US);
H02K11/21 (US);
H02K11/33 (US);
H02K3/50 (US);
H02K7/102 (US);
H02P25/22 (US);
H02P27/06 (KR);
H02P29/028 (US);
H02P3/04 (EP);
B60T2220/04 (KR,US);
B60T2270/10 (US);
B60T2270/304 (US);
B60T2270/402 (EP,US);
B60T2270/403 (US);
B60T2270/404 (US);
B60T2270/413 (EP,US);
B60T2270/82 (US);
B60T2270/88 (US);
B60Y2400/306 (KR);
B60Y2400/81 (KR);
B60Y2410/10 (KR);
H02K2203/09 (US);
H02K2211/03 (KR,US);
H02K2213/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | B60T13/74, B60T17/22, B60T8/171, B60T8/172, H02K5/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN STEUEREINHEIT EINER BREMSANLAGE | [2022/15] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT STRUCTURE OF BRAKE SYSTEM | [2022/15] | French: | STRUCTURE D'UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE SYSTÈME DE FREIN | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | Translation filed | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009079259 (IWASAKI KATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011320099 (KIM JONG SUNG [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20160049807 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108639038 (GELUBO TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20190038662 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2009196626 (ADVICS CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * [0016], [0018], [0022], [0043]-[0045], [0047], [0053], [0059], [0063], [0064], [0074] 1, 2, 4 *; | [X]JP2009196627 (ADVICS CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * [0017], [0019], [0023], [0043]-[0045], [0047], [0053], [0059], [0063], [0064], [0074] 1, 2, 4 *; | [A]US2018065609 (LEIBER HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * [0080]-[0082] 2 *; | [A]WO2018210472 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * 1 3 *; | [A]KR20190032597 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-9* [0042]-[0068] 1, 2 * |