EP3977040 - DISPENSER AND METHOD FOR LAUNCHING COUNTERMEASURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZÄTTERQVIST, Christer Bergsbrunna villaväg 25 757 56 Uppsala / SE | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] |
Former [2022/14] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20818369.9 | 02.06.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020SE50555 | Priority number, date | SE20190050654 | 03.06.2019 Original published format: SE 1950654 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020246931 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977040 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977040 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F41F3/065, B64D1/04, B64D7/06, // F41H11/02, F42B12/70 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B64D1/04 (EP);
F42B12/70 (EP,IL,US);
B64D1/02 (IL,US);
B64D7/00 (IL);
B64D7/06 (EP);
F41F3/065 (EP);
F41H11/02 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | F41H11/02, B64D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDER UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLÖSEN VON GEGENMASSNAHMEN | [2022/14] | English: | DISPENSER AND METHOD FOR LAUNCHING COUNTERMEASURES | [2022/14] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE LANCEMENT DE CONTRE-MESURES | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JP2005172363 (IHI AEROSPACE CO LTD); | [DA]GB2410542 (HELIO MIRROR COMPANY LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP2157398 (KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]EP2219008 (KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & C [DE]); | [A]US2012097795 (ZAETTERQVIST CHRISTER [SE]) |