Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11592352 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2021293656 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117340483 | 07.06.2021 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230121172 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | KR20217025637 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102567664B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2023 | B1 | KR20220017881 | 14.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7426535B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2024 | B2 | JP2023181525 | 21.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | JP2021540133 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7382410B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2023 | B2 | JP2022534829 | 04.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4312023 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A3 | EP4312023 | 31.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | EP20818616 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117824957 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | CN202080007516 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113272635B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2024 | B | CN113272635 | 17.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3881046 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2023 | C0 | EP3881046 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2023 | B1 | EP3881046 | 24.08.2022 | A4 | EP3881046 | 22.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2964551T | 08.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3881046T | 04.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26398 | 02.04.2020 | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020247053 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11067473 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2020386650 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916434546 | 07.06.2019 | Type | Divisional application | EP4312023 |