EP3881046 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HIGH VOLTAGE LEAK DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states PACKAGING TECHNOLOGIES & INSPECTION, LLC 8 Skyline Drive Hawthorne, NY 10532 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRELOAR, Ross 300 Columbus Ave. 2L Tuckahoe, New York 10707 / US | 02 /
O'SULLIVAN, Andrew 145 4th Ave. Apt. 4L Brooklyn, New York 11217 / US | 03 /
WOLF, Heinz 174 River Rd. Hackettstown, New Jersey 07840 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 20818616.3 | 02.04.2020 | [2021/38] | WO2020US26398 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 08.11.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/50] | 15.11.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/51] | 15.11.2023 | Date of registration [2023/51] | 08.11.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/51] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 15.11.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/51] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3881046 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 05 |