22.08.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
20.08.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.08.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.08.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.06.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.04.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
22.03.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.11.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2023 |
First examination report |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.08.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
05.08.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
22.06.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
22.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
11.03.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] |
11.03.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] |
15.02.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.12.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
08.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
11.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|