EP3982567 - COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, COMMUNICATIONS METHOD, AND COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonas, Inc. 24-2, Hongo 5-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHARA, Sotaro c/o Sonas, Inc., 24-2, Hongo 5-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Makoto c/o Sonas, Inc., 24-2, Hongo 5-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20819497.7 | 03.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020JP21992 | Priority number, date | JP20190107428 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019107428 | [2022/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020246515 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982567 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3982567 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L47/32, H04W4/38, H04W28/04, H04W40/02, H04W40/22, H04W76/10, H04W84/18 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H04L1/0045 (EP);
H04W4/38 (EP,CN);
H04L1/0061 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/04 (EP,US);
H04W40/023 (EP,US);
H04W40/22 (EP);
H04W52/0225 (CN);
H04W52/0229 (CN);
H04W52/46 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | H04L1/00, H04W4/38, H04W28/04, H04W40/02, H04W76/10, H04W84/18 | ||
Former IPC [2022/15] | H04L1/00, H04L12/70, H04W4/38, H04W28/04, H04W76/10, H04W84/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/15] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, COMMUNICATIONS METHOD, AND COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | Translation filed | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 20.12.2023 | |
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2922390 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 9 * * page 12, line 3 - page 27, line 24 * * figures 1-8 * * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2009103441 (NAKAMURA MASATO [JP]) [A] 1,4,6,9,11,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0109] ** figures 1-12 *; | [A]US8948037 (MIZRAHI TAL [IL]) [A] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 40 * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 32 * * figure 1 *; | [A] - CHANG TENGFEI ET AL, "Constructive Interference in 802.15.4: A Tutorial", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SURVEYS & TUTORIALS, (20190331), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1109/COMST.2018.2870643, pages 217 - 237, XP011711819 [A] 1-15 * II. Basic Concepts of Constructive Interference * * III. Classifying CI Prior Art * * IV. Modeling and Optimizing CI * * V. Protocol Proposals * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMST.2018.2870643 | International search | [A]JPH03174841 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15 * page 3, upper right column, line 18 to lower right column, line 7, fig. 1, 4(c) *; | [A]US2008062901 (KADOWAKI NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014], [0159]-[0160], fig. 8 *; | [A] - HE, ZHITAO et al., "Arpeggio: a Penetration Attack on Glossy Networks", 2016 13th Annual IEEE International Conference on Sensing, Communication, and Networking (SECON, (20161103), ISBN 978-1-5090-1732-4, XP032993991 [A] 1-15 * , in particular, section IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SAHCN.2016.7732971 | by applicant | JP2008042911 | JP2019107428 | - F. FERRARI et al., "Efficient Network Flooding and Time Synchronization with Glossy", IPSN, (20110000), vol. 11 | - CHAO GAO et al., "Efficient Collection Using Constructive-Interference Flooding in Wireless Sensor Networks", Proceedings of the Society Conference of IEICE 2011 communication, (20110830), vol. 428, no. 2 | - MAKOTO SUZUKITOMONORI NAGAYAMASOTARO OHARAHIROYUKI MORIKAWA, "Structural Monitoring Using Concurrent Transmission Flooding", The Transactions of IEICE B, (20170000), vol. 12, pages 952 - 960 |