EP4061641 - ACCESSORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLOP Digital GmbH Dr.-Arming-Strasse 5 4600 Wels / AT | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINL, Cedric Arnulfweg 9 4501 Neuhofen an der Krems / AT | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 20819612.1 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020AT60414 | Priority number, date | AT20190050205U | 22.11.2019 Original published format: AT 5020519 U | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021097513 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061641 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4061641 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/39, B41J3/36 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B41J3/36 (EP,AT,US);
B41J29/023 (US);
B41J3/39 (EP,AT,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUBEHÖRVORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | ACCESSORY DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 22.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | LU | 20.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5111216 (RICHARDSON MICHAEL M [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 1-11 *; | [I]US5308173 (AMANO TOSHIO [JP], et al) [I] 1-12* figures 1-6 *; | [ID]US5829893 (KINOSHITA NAOHISA [JP], et al) [ID] 1-12 * figures 1-38 *; | [I]US2002101610 (WINNE DIRK [BE]) [I] 1-12 * figures 1-6 *; | [XDI]US2008069620 (ANDERSON MILES EDWARD [US], et al) [XD] 13,14 * figures 1-8 * [I] 1-12; | [I]KR101570047B (BOB [KR]) [I] 1-12 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US5829893 | DE20111008U | DE20311295U | US2008069620 | US7500732 | KR101570047B | EP3539787 |