EP4076335 - MEDICAL PRODUCT HAVING AN IDENTIFIER AND METHOD FOR APPLYING AN IDENTIFIER ONTO A MEDICAL PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOERMANN, Jörn In der Dell 37 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | 02 /
MEISINGER, Sebastian Auf Gottrod 8 66646 Marpingen / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20820313.3 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP86541 | Priority number, date | DE201910134562 | 16.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019134562 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122829 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076335 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/14 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61J1/14 (EP,KR);
G09F3/0297 (US);
A61J1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/40 (KR);
B44C1/1729 (KR);
B65C9/0015 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES PRODUKT MIT KENNZEICHNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER KENNZEICHNUNG AUF EIN MEDIZINISCHES PRODUKT | [2022/43] | English: | MEDICAL PRODUCT HAVING AN IDENTIFIER AND METHOD FOR APPLYING AN IDENTIFIER ONTO A MEDICAL PRODUCT | [2022/43] | French: | PRODUIT MÉDICAL AYANT UN IDENTIFIANT ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION D'UN IDENTIFIANT SUR UN PRODUIT MÉDICAL | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 08.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2004231915 (LINTEC CORP) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] *[I] 6,8,11; | [XI]EP2806004 (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * [I] 6,8,11 |