EP4058875 - KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clevetura LTD Lapetou, 5 Agios Athanasios 4101 Limassol / CY | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHUTSIK, Yury c/o Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | 02 /
ZAKREUSKI, Dzmitry c/o Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | 03 /
KRUPIANKOU, Mikhail c/o Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | 04 /
LITVAK, Yury c/o Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | 05 /
BORYSYONOK, Vasily c/o Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | 06 /
SAKOVICH, Raman c/o Clevetura LLC Kuprevicha st. 1\5, office 205a Minsk, 220141 / BY | 07 /
KOSTEVITCH, Siarhei c/o 43, Kolonakiou Street Diamond Court Ayios Athanasios Limassol 4103 / CY | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20820339.8 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP82166 | Priority number, date | BY20190000285 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: BY 20190285 | BY20190000325 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: BY 20190325 | GB20200016579 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202016579 | GB20200016585 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202016585 | GB20200016586 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202016586 | GB20200016587 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202016587 | GB20200016589 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202016589 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094600 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058875 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02, G06F3/044 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/0202 (EP,CN,GB);
G06F3/02 (CN,GB);
G06F3/0213 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G06F3/04186 (US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,GB,US);
G06F3/038 (GB);
G06F3/0383 (EP);
G06F3/041 (GB);
G06F3/0445 (EP,GB);
G06F3/0446 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G06F3/0448 (EP);
H01H13/7065 (GB);
H01H13/85 (GB);
H01H3/125 (GB);
H03K17/9622 (EP,GB,US);
G06F2203/04103 (US);
G06F3/0443 (US);
H03K2017/9602 (GB);
H03K2217/960755 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | TASTATUR | [2022/38] | English: | KEYBOARD | [2022/38] | French: | CLAVIER | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015185869 (CHNG CHOON PING [US], et al); | [XY]EP3327555 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | WO2019237173 |