EP4072319 - COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN THE REDUCTION OF NOCICEPTION AND OTHER HEALTH BENEFITS IN INFANTS AND YOUNG CHILDREN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/42] | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMAK, Sami Chemin des Esserts 25 1000 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
SPRENGER, Norbert Chemin de la Séchaude 18 1073 Savigny / CH | 03 /
FOATA, Francis Chemin de Belle Combe 12 1093 La Conversion / CH | 04 /
ROCHAT, Florence Quartier des Tilleuls 6 1820 Montreux / CH | 05 /
BOULANGE, Claire Laurence Lucie Marie Chemin de la Chaumière 12 1010 Lausanne / CH | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Loiseau, François Michel Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Gagliardi, Tatiana Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 20820430.5 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020EP85518 | Priority number, date | EP20190215144 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19215144 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021116282 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072319 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/10, A23L33/00, A61K31/702 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP);
A23L33/28 (US);
A61K31/702 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER VERRINGERUNG DER NOZIZEPTION UND ANDERER GESUNDHEITLICHER VORTEILE BEI SÄUGLINGEN UND KLEINKINDERN | [2022/42] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN THE REDUCTION OF NOCICEPTION AND OTHER HEALTH BENEFITS IN INFANTS AND YOUNG CHILDREN | [2022/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS LA RÉDUCTION DE LA NOCICEPTION ET AUTRES AVANTAGES POUR LA SANTÉ CHEZ DES NOURRISSONS ET DES ENFANTS EN BAS ÂGE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 11.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2016296542 (SANGILD PER TORP [DK]); | [X]US2018036323 (SPRENGER NORBERT [CH], et al); | [X]US2018042949 (SPRENGER NORBERT [CH], et al); | [XDY]US2018078572 (SPRENGER NORBERT [CH], et al); | [X]US2018110253 (SPRENGER NORBERT [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2018206434 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [X]US2018368460 (MCCONNELL BRUCE [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2019121929 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | by applicant | US5288637 | WO9610086 | US2016243139 | WO2016139329 | WO2019121929 |