06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
08.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
09.02.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
05.02.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.11.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
24.02.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
24.02.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
21.02.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.01.2023 |
First examination report |
|
26.01.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.05.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
30.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
05.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
03.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|