EP4076862 - PASSIVE LOAD BALANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBELLAN, Adrien 30 rue du Moulin 91430 IGNY / FR | 02 /
LAMY, Xavier 23 rue Hédouin 92190 MEUDON / FR | 03 /
RIWAN, Alain 4 Allée Didier Daurat 94550 CHEVILLY-LARUE / FR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Boettcher, et al 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/06] | Decorchemont, Audrey Véronique Christèle, et al Cabinet Boettcher 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2022/43] | Decorchemont, Audrey Véronique Christèle, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20820457.8 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP85935 | Priority number, date | FR20190015151 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915151 | [2022/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122432 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076862 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4076862 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B25J9/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PASSIVER LASTAUSGLEICH | [2022/43] | English: | PASSIVE LOAD BALANCER | [2022/43] | French: | EQUILIBREUR DE CHARGE PASSIF | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 27.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2948276 (SCUOLA SUPERIORE S ANNA [IT]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0072] - [0079] - [0085] - [0087] - [0092] - [0099] * * figures 1A,1C,2 *; | [A]WO2016187275 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0101] * * figures 47,48 *; | [A]US2017224517 (DOYLE MARK C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0046] , [0061] - [0069] * * figures 1,2,7-9 *; | [A]DE102016123797 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0044] - [0054] ** figures 1-3 * |