EP4061396 - TREATING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296 Tel-Aviv 6139201 / IL | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNON, Ruth Meonot Shine 9 the Weizmann Institute of Science 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
MARON, Ruth c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
ARMONY, Gad c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
TSOORY, Michael Menachem c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 05 /
WILCHEK, Meir c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 06 /
FRENKEL, Dan c/o Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296 6139201 Tel Aviv / IL | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20820571.6 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020IL51196 | Priority number, date | IL20190270800 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: IL 27080019 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021100041 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061396 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/10, A61K38/16, A61K39/395, A61P25/16 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A61K38/1716 (EP,IL);
A61K38/00 (IL);
C07K14/4711 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/04 (IL);
A61K38/10 (IL);
A61K9/0043 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,US);
C07K7/06 (IL);
C07K7/08 (IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER | [2022/39] | English: | TREATING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2022/39] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 17.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2013041962 (AXON NEUROSCIENCE SE [SK], et al) [X] 1-5,18,19 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0030] , [0060] , [0068] , [0323] * * claims 1,43 * [Y] 1-43; | [XY]US2015320706 (IMBIMBO BRUNO PIETRO [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 1-43; | [XY]WO2016198627 (INSERM (INSTITUT NAT DE LA SANTÉ ET DE LA RECH MÉDICALE) [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,18,19 * sequence 1 * * claims 1,4,14 * [Y] 1-43; | [Y] - Giorgio Giaccone ET AL, "(Copynoht c Ameiwcan Societ/fcjr Iniesligallive Pathology, Short Communication f3PP and Tau Interaction A Possible Link between Amyloid and Neurofibrillary Tangles in Alzheimer's Disease", (19960101), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC1861592/pdf/amjpathol00037-0083.pdf, (20210201), XP055770790 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * | [Y] - BARBATO C ET AL, "Interaction of Tau with Fe65 links tau to APP", NEUROBIOLOGY OF DISEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050301), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.NBD.2004.10.011, ISSN 0969-9961, pages 399 - 408, XP004728747 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbd.2004.10.011 | by applicant | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US4879219 | US5011771 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US5281521 | US6472505 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP _001116539 | - J. MEIENHOFER, Hormonal Proteins and Peptides, Academic Press, (19730000), vol. 2, page 46 | - G. SCHRODERK. LUPKE, The Peptides, Academic Press, (19650000), vol. 1 | - Andersson Biopolymers, (20000000), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 227 - 50 | - SMITH, T. F.WATERMAN, M. S, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - NEEDLEMAN, S. B.WUNSCH, C. D., J. Mol. Biol., vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - FINGL et al., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (19750000), page 1 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (19940000), vol. I-III | - LEE GCOWAN NKIRSCHNER M, "The primary structure and heterogeneity of tau protein from mouse brain", Science, (19880000), vol. 239, no. 4837, pages 285 - 288 | - WATSON et al., "Recombinant DNA", Scientific American Books, New York | - Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19980000), vol. 1-4 | - FRESHNEY, Culture of Animal Cells - A Manual of Basic Technique, Appleton & Lange, (19940000), vol. I-III | - "A Practical Guide to Molecular Cloning", PERBAL, B., Transcription and Translation, Academic Press, (19840000), vol. 1-317 | - GRUNDKE-IQBAL I et al., "Abnormal phosphorylation of the microtubule-associated protein tau (tau) in Alzheimer cytoskeletal pathology", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (19860000), vol. 83, no. 13, pages 4913 - 4917 | - ALTSCHUL SFGISH WMILLER WMYERS EWLIPMAN DJ, "Basic local alignment search tool", Journal of molecular biology, (19900000), vol. 215, no. 3, doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999 | - TEITELBAUM DFRIDKIS-HARELI MARNON RSELA M, "Copolymer 1 inhibits chronic relapsing experimental allergic encephalomyelitis induced by proteolipid protein (PLP) peptides in mice and interferes with PLP-specific T cell responses", Journal of neuroimmunology, (19960000), vol. 64, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0165-5728(95)00180-8, pages 209 - 217, XP002926269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-5728(95)00180-8 | - BEN-YEDIDIA TARNON R, "Towards an epitope-based human vaccine for influenza", Human Vaccines, (20050000), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 95 - 101 | - LOWELL GHZIV SBRUZIL SBABECOFF RBEN-YEDIDIA T, "Back to the future: immunization with M-001 prior to trivalent influenza vaccine in 2011/12 enhanced protective immune responses against 2014/15 epidemic strain", Vaccine, (20170000), vol. 35, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2016.12.063, pages 713 - 715, XP029887925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2016.12.063 | - SANDOMENICO A et al., "Protein-Protein Interactions: A Simple Strategy to Identify Binding Sites and Peptide Antagonists", Chemical biology & drug design, (20090000), vol. 73, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1747-0285.2009.00805.x, pages 483 - 493, XP055327401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1747-0285.2009.00805.x | - SELA MARNON R, "Studies on the chemical basis of the antigenicity of proteins. 1. Antigenicity of polypeptidyl gelatins", Biochemical Journal, (19600000), vol. 75, no. 1, doi:10.1042/bj0750091, page 91, XP055261301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj0750091 | - ARNON RSELA M, "Studies on the chemical basis of the antigenicity of proteins. 2. Antigenic specificity of polytyrosyl gelatins", Biochemical Journal, (19600000), vol. 75, no. 1, doi:10.1042/bj0750103, page 103, XP055261072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj0750103 | - ARNON RMARON ESELA MANFINSEN CB, "Antibodies reactive with native lysozyme elicited by a completely synthetic antigen", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (19710000), vol. 68, no. 7, pages 1450 - 1455 | - GEIGER BARNON R, "Immunogenicity and antigenic specificity of the loop fragment of lysozyme", European journal of immunology, (19740000), vol. 4, no. 9, pages 632 - 634 | - TEITELBAUM DMESHORER AHIRSHFELD TARNON RSELA M, "Suppression of experimental allergic encephalomyelitis by a synthetic polypeptide", European journal of immunology, (19710000), vol. 1, no. 4, doi:10.1002/eji.1830010406, pages 242 - 248, XP002926270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830010406 | - LANGBEHEIM HARNON RSELA M, "Antiviral effect on MS-2 coliphage obtained with a synthetic antigen", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (19780000), vol. 73, no. 12, pages 4636 - 4640 | - LANGBEHEIM HTEITELBAUM DARNON R, "Cellular immune response toward MS-2 phage and a synthetic fragment of its coat protein", Cellular immunology, (19780000), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0008-8749(78)90046-1, pages 193 - 197, XP024000852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-8749(78)90046-1 | - APOSTOLOVA LG, "Alzheimer Disease", Continuum (Minneap Minn, (20160000), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 419 - 434 | - O'BRIEN RJWONG PC, "Amyloid precursor protein processing and Alzheimer's disease", Annual review of neuroscience, (20110000), vol. 34, doi:10.1146/annurev-neuro-061010-113613, pages 185 - 204, XP055254065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-neuro-061010-113613 | - "Alzheimer disease in 2020", HOLTZMAN DMMANDELKOW ESELKOE DJ, perspectives in medicine, Cold Spring Harbor, (20120000), vol. 2, page a011585 | - MUDHER ALOVESTONE S, "Alzheimer's disease-do tauists and baptists finally shake hands?", Trends in neurosciences, (20020000), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0166-2236(00)02031-2, pages 22 - 26, XP004332378 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-2236(00)02031-2 | - LANSDALL CJ, "An effective treatment for Alzheimer's disease must consider both amyloid and tau", Bioscience horizons, (20140000), vol. 7, pages 1 - 11 | - SMITH MA et al., "Tau protein directly interacts with the amyloid 0-protein precursor: implications for Alzheimer's disease", Nature medicine, (19950000), vol. 1, no. 4, page 365 | - GIACCONE G et al., "beta PP and Tau interaction. A possible link between amyloid and neurofibrillary tangles in Alzheimer's disease", The American journal of pathology, (19960000), vol. 148, no. 1, page 79 | - PUNDIR SMARTIN MJO'DONOVAN CCONSORTIUM U, "UniProt tools", Current protocols in bioinformatics, (20160000), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 1.29. 21 - 21.29. 15 | - WANG YHA Y, "The X-ray structure of an antiparallel dimer of the human amyloid precursor protein E2 domain", Molecular cell, (20040000), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2004.06.037, pages 343 - 353, XP002475328 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2004.06.037 | - NEDDENS J et al., "Phosphorylation of different tau sites during progression of Alzheimer's disease", Acta neuropathologica communications, (20180000), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s40478-018-0557-6, page 52, XP021258012 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40478-018-0557-6 | - ESPARZA TJ et al., "Soluble amyloid-beta aggregates from human Alzheimer's disease brains", Scientific reports, (20160000), vol. 6, page 38187 | - GANESHPURKAR A et al., "Protein-Protein Interactions and Aggregation Inhibitors in Alzheimer's Disease", Current topics in medicinal chemistry, (20190000), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 501 - 533 | - KUPFER LHINRICHS WGROSCHUP MH, "Prion protein misfolding", Current molecular medicine, (20090000), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 826 - 835 | - ROSSJOHN J et al., "Crystal structure of the N-terminal, growth factor-like domain of Alzheimer amyloid precursor protein", Nature Structural & Molecular Biology, (19990000), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1038/7562, page 327, XP002907100 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/7562 | - SAYAS CL et al., "Role of tau N-terminal motif in the secretion of human tau by end binding proteins", PloS One, (20190000), vol. 14, no. 1, page e0210864 | - OAKLEY H et al., "Intraneuronal 0-amyloid aggregates, neurodegeneration, and neuron loss in transgenic mice with five familial Alzheimer's disease mutations: potential factors in amyloid plaque formation", Journal of Neuroscience, (20060000), vol. 26, no. 40, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1202-06.2006, pages 10129 - 10140, XP002688009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1202-06.2006 | - ROSENMANN H et al., "A novel transgenic mouse expressing double mutant tau driven by its natural promoter exhibits tauopathy characteristics", Experimental neurology, (20080000), vol. 212, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.expneurol.2008.03.007, pages 71 - 84, XP022714963 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.expneurol.2008.03.007 | - WESTERMAN MA et al., "The relationship between Ap and memory in the Tg2576 mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", Journal of Neuroscience, (20020000), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 1858 - 1867 | - KANNO TTSUCHIYA ANISHIZAKI T, "Hyperphosphorylation of Tau at Ser396 occurs in the much earlier stage than appearance of learning and memory disorders in 5XFAD mice", Behavioural brain research, (20140000), vol. 274, doi:10.1016/j.bbr.2014.08.034, pages 302 - 306, XP029067801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbr.2014.08.034 | - VERGARA PANOS C et al., "PHF-tau propagation in the presence of Amyloid 13 pathology", 6TH BELGIAN BRAIN CONGRESS (Mons, Belgium, (20160000), pages 8 - 10 | - POLANCO JG et al., "Amyloid-P and tau complexity-towards improved biomarkers and targeted therapies", Nature Reviews Neurology, (20170000), vol. 14, no. 1, page 22 | - TRUDLER DWEINREB OMANDEL SAYOUDIM MBHFRENKEL D, "DJ-1 deficiency triggers microglia sensitivity to dopamine toward a pro-inflammatory phenotype that is attenuated by rasagiline", Journal of neurochemistry, (20140000), vol. 129, no. 3, pages 434 - 447 | - SMALL SADUFF K, "Linking Ap and tau in late-onset Alzheimer's disease: a dual pathway hypothesis", Neuron, (20080000), vol. 60, no. 4, pages 534 - 542 | - DOU F et al., "Chaperones increase association of tau protein with microtubules", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20030000), vol. 100, no. 2, pages 721 - 726 | - LEITNER AWALZTHOENI TAEBERSOLD R, "Lysine-specific chemical cross-linking of protein complexes and identification of cross-linking sites using LC-MS/MS and the xQuest/xProphet software pipeline", Nature protocols, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 1, page 120 | - LEITNER A et al., "Chemical cross-linking/mass spectrometry targeting acidic residues in proteins and protein complexes", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 26, pages 9455 - 9460 | - HOLMES KLLANTZ LM, "Protein labeling with fluorescent probes", Methods Cell Biol, (20010000), vol. 63, pages 185 - 203 | - DEMATTOS RBBALES KRCUMMINS DJPAUL SMHOLTZMAN DM, "Brain to plasma amyloid-P efflux: a measure of brain amyloid burden in a mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", Science, (20020000), vol. 295, no. 5563, doi:10.1126/science.1067568, pages 2264 - 2267, XP002343830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1067568 | - WEBSTER SJBACHSTETTER ADNELSON PTSCHMITT FAVAN ELDIK LJ, "Using mice to model Alzheimer's dementia: an overview of the clinical disease and the preclinical behavioral changes in 10 mouse models", Frontiers in genetics, (20140000), vol. 5, page 88 | - HEREDIA LTORRENTE MCOLOMINA MTDOMINGO JL, "Assessing anxiety in C57BL/6J mice: a pharmacological characterization of the open-field and light/dark tests", Journal of pharmacological and toxicological methods, (20140000), vol. 69, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.vascn.2013.12.005, pages 108 - 114, XP028636200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vascn.2013.12.005 | - LIFSHITZ V et al., "Immunotherapy of cerebrovascular amyloidosis in a transgenic mouse model", Neurobiology of aging, (20120000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 432. e431 - 432. e413 | - JI X et al., "Astaxanthin improves cognitive performance in mice following mild traumatic brain injury", Brain research, (20170000), vol. 1659, doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2016.12.031, pages 88 - 95, XP029923611 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2016.12.031 |