EP3965210 - BATTERY MODULE AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Gen No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
YAO, Jihua No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Ran, Handong, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20821105.2 | 21.05.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN91645 | Priority number, date | CN201910574473 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910574473 | [2022/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020259144 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965210 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, H01M50/284, H01M50/287, H01M50/209, H01M50/298, H01M50/271, H01M50/505 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H01M10/486 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/653 (US);
H01M10/6554 (US);
H01M50/249 (US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
H01M50/287 (EP,US);
H01M50/298 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,US);
H01M6/5083 (CN);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H01M10/48, H01M6/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/10] | English: | BATTERY MODULE AND DEVICE | [2022/10] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | Translation filed | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2018080033 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [XA]CN207558994U (GREAT WALL MOTOR CO LTD); | [E]WO2020168206 (CPS TECH HOLDINGS LLC [US]) | International search | [Y]CN204029949U (SHENZHEN BYD LITHIUM BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]CN204029949U (SHENZHEN BYD LITHIUM BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JP2016018741 (YAZAKI CORP, et al); | [Y]CN207116634U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN207116634U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN207781834U (LISHEN POWER BATTERY SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [A]CN208806294U (SUZHOU WEST DEANE MACHINERY INC) |