EP4070125 - TIME OF FLIGHT SENSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ams Sensors Singapore Pte. Ltd. 7000 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 5, 02-00 Singapore 569877 / SG | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOPPA, David c/o ams AG, IP Department, High Tech Campus 41 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAELLO PAÑOS, Miguel Bruno c/o ams AG, IP Department, High Tech Campus 41 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Ding, Yuan, et al Osram GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Straße 6 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20821440.3 | 02.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020SG50710 | Priority number, date | US201962944009P | 05.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962944009 P | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021112763 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070125 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S7/4863, G01S17/894 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
G01S17/894 (EP);
G01S7/4865 (US);
G01B11/22 (US);
G01S17/04 (US);
G01S17/10 (US);
G01S17/89 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | FLUGZEITMESSVERFAHREN | [2022/41] | English: | TIME OF FLIGHT SENSING METHOD | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE TEMPS DE VOL | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014253688 (METZ WERNER ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,10,11,14,15,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0062] * [I] 2,3,5,7-9,13,16,18-20; | [A]US2015312537 (SOLHUSVIK JOHANNES [NO], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]WO2019064062 (INNOVIZ TECH LTD [IL]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0384] - paragraph [0456] * * abstract *; | [A]DE102017223102 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |