EP4059299 - TRANSMISSION OF UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION (UCI) BASED ON PRIORITY RULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
BHATTAD, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
THYAGARAJAN, Ananta Narayanan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20821508.7 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020US60590 | Priority number, date | IN201941046603 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: IN201941046603 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021097354 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059299 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L5/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON UPLINKSTEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN (UCI) AUF DER GRUNDLAGE VON PRIORITÄTSREGELN | [2022/38] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION (UCI) BASED ON PRIORITY RULES | [2022/38] | French: | TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE (UCI) D'APRÈS DES RÈGLES DE PRIORITÉ | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 19.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN109802819 (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al) [A] 1-40 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0233] * * claims 16-35 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US2019230683 (AKKARAKARAN SONY [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,15,22,28,29,38 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * * claims 1-30 * [A] 2-5,8-14,16-21,23-27,39,40; | US2020367265 [ ] (WANG YI [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0233] * * claims 16-35 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XA] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Remaining issues for multiplexing UCI on PUSCH", (20180302), pages 1 - 13, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1802839, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180217), XP051398252 [X] 1,6,7,15,22,28,29,38 * page 7, paragraph 2.4 * [A] 2-5,8-14,16-21,23-27,39,40 |