EP3980543 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DBA USING GATA1 GENE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANKARAN, Vijay G. 101 Sycamore Street Roslindale, Massachusetts 02131 / US | 02 /
VOIT, Richard A. 39 Quirk Street Watertown, Massachusetts 02472 / US | 03 /
LUDWIG, Leif S. 884-888 Massachusetts Avenue Apt. 310 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20821689.5 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020US36600 | Priority number, date | US201962859369P | 10.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962859369 P | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020251887 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980543 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, A61P7/00, A61K35/12, A61P7/06, C12N15/63 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K48/0066 (US);
A61K38/1709 (US);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61K48/0058 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP,US);
C07K14/4702 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N2310/141 (EP);
C12N2740/16043 (EP);
C12N2830/008 (EP);
C12N2830/48 (EP);
C12N2840/203 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DBA MITTELS GATA1-GENTHERAPIE | [2022/15] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DBA USING GATA1 GENE THERAPY | [2022/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DBA AU MOYEN D'UNE THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE AVEC GATA1 | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - WHYATT D ET AL, "The level of the tissue-specific factor GATA-1 affects the cell-cycle machinery", GENES AND FUNCTION, GB, vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1046/j.1365-4624.1997.00003.x, ISSN 1360-7413, (19970201), pages 11 - 24, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/pdf/10.1046/j.1365-4624.1997.00003.x, XP093058004 [X] 1,2,5,6,9,12,14 * abstract, results, discussion, experimental procedures, figure 1; * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-4624.1997.00003.x | [XY] - LI Q ET AL, "Binary transgenic mouse model for studying the trans control of globin gene switching: Evidence that GATA-1 is an in vivo repressor of human [epsilon]?gene?expression", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (19970318), vol. 94, no. 6, doi:10.1073/pnas.94.6.2444, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2444 - 2448, XP093058003 [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12,14 * abstract, materials and methods, results, figure 1; * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.6.2444 | [Y] - ROMANO O ET AL, "Transcriptional, epigenetic and retroviral signatures identify regulatory regions involved in hematopoietic lineage commitment", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep24724, (20160420), URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/srep24724, XP093057703 [Y] 1-15 * abstract, results, discussion, methods, supplementary information; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep24724 | [Y] - Romano O ET AL, "SUPPLEMENTARY INFORMATION Transcriptional, epigenetic and retroviral signatures identify regulatory regions involved in hematopoietic lineage commitment", (20160420), URL: https://static-content.springer.com/esm/art%3A10.1038%2Fsrep24724/MediaObjects/41598_2016_BFsrep24724_MOESM25_ESM.pdf, (20230626), XP093057706 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - TOSCANO M G ET AL, "Physiological and tissue-specific vectors for treatment of inherited diseases", GENE THERAPY, (20110201), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1038/gt.2010.138, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 117 - 127, XP055088392 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2010.138 | [Y] - SHIMIZU R ET AL, "Gene expression regulation and domain function of hematopoietic GATA factors", SEMINARS IN CELL AND DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, GB, (20050201), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.SEMCDB.2004.11.001, ISSN 1084-9521, pages 129 - 136, XP004711663 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.semcdb.2004.11.001 | [A] - DEBNATH S ET AL, "Lentiviral Vectors with Cellular Promoters Correct Anemia and Lethal Bone Marrow Failure in a Mouse Model for Diamond-Blackfan Anemia", MOLECULAR THERAPY, US, vol. 25, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.04.002, ISSN 1525-0016, (20170801), pages 1805 - 1814, URL: https://www.cell.com/molecular-therapy-family/molecular-therapy/pdfExtended/S1525-0016(17)30161-2, XP055879911 [A] 1-15 * abstract, results, discussion, materials and methods; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.04.002 | International search | [Y]US2018223360 (HATCHWELL ELI [GB], et al) [Y] 3* Abstract; Claim 16; para [0268]; para [0414]; SEQ ID NO:167 *; | [Y] - LUDWIG et al., "Altered translation of GATA1 in Diamond-Blackfan anemia", Nat Med., (20140700), vol. 20, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nm.3557, pages 748 - 753, XP055586991 [Y] 1-4 * . Abstract; p2, Fig.1 legend; p7, col 2, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.3557 | [Y] - SURINYA et al., "Identification and Characterization of a Conserved Erythroid-specific Enhancer Located in Intron 8 of the Human 5-Aminolevulinate Synthase 2 Gene", J. Biol. Chem., (19980703), vol. 273, no. 27, doi:10.1074/jbc.273.27.16798, pages 16798 - 16809, XP002126819 [Y] 1-4 * . Abstract; p16799, col 2, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.27.16798 |