EP3980378 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING SODIUM HYDROSULFITE CRYSTALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silox Canada Inc. 2324 Eistein Quebec, Québec G1P 3S2 / CA | [2022/36] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states Hydro Technologies (Canada) Inc. 2324 Eistein Quebec, Québec G1P 3S2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUVILLE, Patrice 1165 rue Clair-de-Lune Quebec, Québec G3K 1C9 / CA | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 17-21, rue Saint-Fiacre 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 56, Bd Niels Bohr CS 52132 69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20821730.7 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020CA50769 | Priority number, date | US201962859381P | 10.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962859381 P | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020248045 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980378 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01D5/14, C01B17/62 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
C01D5/16 (EP);
C01B17/66 (US);
C01B17/62 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | C01D5/14, C01B17/62, C30B29/46, C30B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NATRIUMHYDROSULFITKRISTALLEN | [2022/15] | English: | PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING SODIUM HYDROSULFITE CRYSTALS | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE CRISTAUX D'HYDROSULFITE DE SODIUM | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 07.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3054658 (CRAWFORD FRANKLIN RICHARD, et al) [X] 1-41 * Abstract, claims col 1, lines 10-55, Examples *; | [X]CA896842 (VIRGINIA CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-41 * Abstract, Claims *; | [X]US4388291 (ARAKAWA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-41 * Abstract, claims, col 1, liens 5-30, col 2, lines 23-40 *; | [X]US5296210 (OGLESBY DONALD M [US]) [X] 1-41* Abstract * |