EP3982897 - BATTERIES THAT DEACTIVATE IN A CONDUCTIVE AQUEOUS MEDIUM AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fenwood Labs Inc. 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, CT 06824 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAULICHT, Bryan 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, Connecticut 06824 / US | 02 /
MYERBERG, Jonah 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, Connecticut 06824 / US | 03 /
VASUDEVAN, Ravikumar 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, Connecticut 06824 / US | 04 /
KELLY, Zachary A. 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, Connecticut 06824 / US | 05 /
KARP, Jeff M. 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, Connecticut 06824 / US | 06 /
LANGER, Robert 1073 N. Benson Road Fairfield, Connecticut 06824 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20823115.9 | 10.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US36963 | Priority number, date | US201962861280P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861280 P | US201962898140P | 10.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962898140 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020251998 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982897 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61F17/00, H01M50/109, H01M50/124, H01M50/19, H01M50/197, H01M50/198, H01M50/548, H01M50/56, H01M50/574, H01M50/59 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01M50/109 (EP,US);
H01M50/574 (EP,US);
H01M50/1243 (EP,US);
H01M50/19 (EP);
H01M50/197 (EP,US);
H01M50/198 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | A61F13/00, A61F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | IN EINEM LEITFÄHIGEN WÄSSRIGEN MEDIUM DEAKTIVIERENDE BATTERIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/16] | English: | BATTERIES THAT DEACTIVATE IN A CONDUCTIVE AQUEOUS MEDIUM AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2022/16] | French: | BATTERIES DÉSACTIVÉES DANS UN MILIEU AQUEUX CONDUCTEUR ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2017162771 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 46] , [0 50] , [0 51] ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2018138467 (TAKAHASHI TADAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0 20] - [0029] - [0037] , [0042] - [0050] - [0053] * | International search | [A]US3655450 (SOTO-KREBS LUIS A) [A] 1-3, 78-81, 104-117, 119-125 * ), col 3, In 53-56; col 4, In 40-61 *; | [A]US2002187392 (ISHIZAKI MORIO [JP]) [A] 1-3, 78-81, 104-117, 119-125* ), entire document *; | [A]US6551742 (HUQ ROKEYA [US], et al) [A] 113, 120-125 * ), col 3, In 45-53 *; | [A]US2006115724 (BUCKLE KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 78-81, 104-117, 119-125 * ), Fig 1, 2; para [0027]-[0031], [0047] *; | [A]US2007283558 (KELEMEN MARC P [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 78-81, 104-117, 119-125 * ), entire document *; | [A]US2010076467 (YASUDA MAMORU [JP]) [A] 1-3 * ), Fig 1, 2; para [0016] [0023], [0062] [0066] *; | [A]JP2013033937 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [A] 1-3, 78-81, 104-117, 119-125 * ), entire document *; | [A]US2018159093 (BARENBERG SUMNER A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * ), Fig 1, 2; para [0005], [0021], [0022], [0062] * |