EP4072755 - ACTIVE CLIMATE CONTROL IN SLM PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Realizer GmbH Hauptstraße 35 33178 Borchen / DE | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESCHETNIK, Wadim Uhlmannstr. 12 59557 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
ADAM, Guido Querweg 119 33098 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
TIMMER, Marc Ferdinandstr. 75 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/42] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20823753.7 | 07.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020EP84819 | Priority number, date | DE201910219417 | 12.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019219417 | [2022/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021115994 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072755 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4072755 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/28, B22F10/32, B22F12/70, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/02, B22F10/73, B22F10/77 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B22F10/28 (EP);
B23K26/123 (US);
B22F10/32 (EP);
B22F12/70 (EP);
B23K26/34 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
B33Y50/02 (EP);
B22F10/73 (EP);
B22F10/77 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F12/70, B22F12/10, B22F12/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE KLIMATISIERUNG IN SLM-PROZESSEN | [2022/42] | English: | ACTIVE CLIMATE CONTROL IN SLM PROCESSES | [2022/42] | French: | CLIMATISATION ACTIVE DANS DES PROCESSUS DE FUSION SÉLECTIVE PAR LASER | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 10.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP3209446 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,8-11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0038] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP3281726 (SLM SOLUTIONS GROUP AG [DE]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0056] ** figure 1 *; | [XY]EP3539695 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3-6,8-11 * paragraphs [0042] - [0061] * * page 1; figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [Y] - Wilhelm Meiners, "Direktes Selektives Laser Sintern einkomponentiger metallischer Werkstoffe", Von der Fakultat tor Maschinenwesen der Rheinisch- Westf?lischen Technischen Hochschule Aachen zur Erlangung des akademischen Grades eines Doktors der lngenieurwissenschaften genehmigte Dissertation, (19990401), pages 43 - 49, URL: http://publica.fraunhofer.de/documents/B-63293.html, (20160420), XP002802104 [Y] 2 * Abschnitt 4.4 * | by applicant | WO9824574 | DE19905067 | DE10112591 | DE102005014483 | EP2052845 | DE102009038165 | DE102012221641 | EP2992986 | WO2017084781 | WO2017220744 |