EP4078146 - LENSLESS INFRARED MULTI-SPECTRAL IMAGING DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPOY, Mathieu CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 9 / FR | 02 /
LORENT, Emerick CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 9 / FR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Libérté FR-06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 20824259.4 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP86546 | Priority number, date | FR20190014926 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1914926 | [2022/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122833 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078146 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N21/3563 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G01N21/35 (EP,US);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (US);
G01J3/2823 (US);
G01J2003/2826 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | LINSENLOSE INFRAROT-MULTISPEKTRALABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/43] | English: | LENSLESS INFRARED MULTI-SPECTRAL IMAGING DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE MULTI-SPECTRALE INFRAROUGE SANS LENTILLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 10.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007296688 (NAKAMURA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8,13 * figures 1, 3, 4 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 30] - [0049] - [0 71] - [0088] * [I] 3-7; | [A]EP2657793 (IMEC [BE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 3-8 *; | [A]US2014125642 (PEARLSTEIN LARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]WO2015167492 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 4 *; | [I]WO2018015517 (IMEC VZW [BE]) [I] 1,2,5,7-12 * abstract * * page 13, line 27 - page 19, line 27 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP3502666 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 36] - [0054] * * figures 1C, 3A-3G *; | [A] - LIU DEXING ET AL, "Lensless Infrared Image Processing Method Based on Fresnel Aperture", 2019 44TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFRARED, MILLIMETER, AND TERAHERTZ WAVES (IRMMW-THZ), IEEE, (201909), doi:10.1109/IRMMW-THZ.2019.8873965, pages 1 - 2, XP033636783 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IRMMW-THz.2019.8873965 | [A] - EVAN L ERICKSON ET AL, "Miniature lensless computational infrared imager", ELECTRONIC IMAGING, (20160214), vol. 2016, no. 12, doi:10.2352/ISSN.2470-1173.2016.12.IMSE-269, ISSN 2470-1173, pages 1 - 4, XP055710005 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2352/ISSN.2470-1173.2016.12.IMSE-269 | by applicant | - K. ISENSEE et al., "Biomedical applications of mid-infrared quantum cascade lasers - a review", The Analyst, (20180000), vol. 143, no. 24, pages 5888 - 5911 |