EP4058739 - HEATING SUPPORT FOR OBJECTS TO BE HEATED AND HEATING CLOSET COMPRISING SUCH HEATING SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zehnder Group International AG Moortalstrasse 1 5722 Gränichen / CH | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIESI, Ruedi Meierhofrain 42 8820 Wädenswil / CH | 02 /
SHERLING, Alan 4 Cumberland Terrace Regent's Park London, Greater London NW1 4HS / GB | 03 /
BLACKMAN, Jackie 4 Cumberland Terrace Regent's Park London, Greater London NW1 4HS / GB | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20824626.4 | 04.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020IB60340 | Priority number, date | CH20190001431 | 11.11.2019 Original published format: CH 14312019 | CH20190001436 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: CH 14362019 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094874 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058739 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24H3/00, A47K10/06, F24H3/04, F24H9/20, F28D15/02, D06F59/00, F28D1/02 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
F24H3/004 (EP);
F24H15/20 (EP,US);
D06F58/16 (EP);
F24H15/128 (EP,US);
F24H15/254 (EP,US);
F24H15/37 (EP,US);
F24H3/0411 (EP);
F24H9/2071 (EP,US);
F28D1/0226 (EP);
D06F57/12 (EP);
D06F58/00 (EP);
D06F59/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | HEIZTRÄGER FÜR ZU ERWÄRMENDE GEGENSTÄNDE UND HEIZSCHRANK MIT EINEM SOLCHEN HEIZTRÄGER | [2022/38] | English: | HEATING SUPPORT FOR OBJECTS TO BE HEATED AND HEATING CLOSET COMPRISING SUCH HEATING SUPPORT | [2022/38] | French: | SUPPORT DE CHAUFFAGE D'OBJETS À CHAUFFER ET ARMOIRE DE CHAUFFAGE COMPRENANT UN TEL SUPPORT DE CHAUFFAGE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 10.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2098897 (THOMSON CSF) [X] 1-6,9-16,18-21,26,34,36-38 * page 1, line 19 - page 4, line 10; figures 5,2,4,3 * [I] 27-29,31,32,40,41; | [XAI]WO0214769 (LAMBCO HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,9-18,20-22,26,33-36,39 * page 6, line 8 - page 12, line 23; figures 1,3,5,6,7 * [A] 25 [I] 23,24,27-29,31,32,38,40,41; | [XI]KR20060008506 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,42 * the whole document * [I] 43-45; | [XI]US2009289052 (BAKKE ALLAN PAUL [US]) [X] 1,3-5,10,11,14-16,18-21,26,28 * page 1, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 67; figures 1,3 * [I] 8,27,29,31,32,40,41; | [XI]WO2013183937 (ILG ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-11,18,20,26,27,34-36,38 * the whole document *[I] 8,28-32 |