EP4061863 - MULTISTAGE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2211 H.H. Dow Way Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAN, Tian 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 02 /
ZENG, Fanwen 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 03 /
LU, Xiaodong 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 04 /
SHULMAN, Inna 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 05 /
RATANI, Tanvi S. 278 E Colorado Blvd Apt 1612 Pasadena, California 91101 / US | 06 /
FISK, Jason S. 1710 Building, Washington Street Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 07 /
KUO, Tzu-Chi 1702 Building, Washington Street Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Corner House 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20824766.8 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US60976 | Priority number, date | US201962938464P | 21.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938464 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021101944 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061863 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F230/08, C08F265/06, C08F220/10, C08F220/18, C08F220/26, A61K8/81, C09D133/14 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/8152 (EP,KR);
C08F265/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/06 (KR,US);
C08F220/10 (EP,KR);
C08F220/1804 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/40 (KR);
C08F230/08 (KR,US);
C09D133/12 (EP,US);
C09D133/14 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/10, C08F2/24 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F220/14, C08F230/08, C08F220/40, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F265/06, C08F220/06, C08F220/14, C08F230/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGES POLYMER | [2022/39] | English: | MULTISTAGE POLYMER | [2022/39] | French: | POLYMÈRE À PHASES MULTIPLES | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 20.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4743667 (MIZUTANI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0378370 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-10* example 4 *; | [A]US4988788 (TAKARADA MITSUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0963751 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2020076549 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [AP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2020123197 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [AP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2020123196 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [AP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - ZHANG ET AL, "A novel approach for the preparation of organic-siloxane oligomers and the creation of hydrophobic surface", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071019), vol. 254, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2007.06.030, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 452 - 458, XP022304687 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2007.06.030 | by applicant | US6403074 |