EP4091374 - SYSTEM WITH MODULATED SIGNAL TO COMPENSATE FREQUENCY ERRORS IN LTE SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AST & Science, LLC 100 SE 2nd Street, Suite 3500 Miami, FL 33131 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Huiwen 12329 Greenbriar Branch Drive Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | 02 /
TANGUTOORI, Praveen Kumar H.No.: 1-2-50/103, Brindavan Estates, Nizampet Road Kukatpally Hyderabad Telangana 500085 / IN | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 20825045.6 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/47] | WO2020US61532 | Priority number, date | IN202011001814 | 15.01.2020 Original published format: IN202011001814 | US202063033087P | 01.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063033087 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145956 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091374 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04B7/185 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04W56/0035 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/005 (KR,US);
H04B7/1858 (KR,US);
H04B7/18513 (EP,KR);
H04B7/195 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT MODULIERTEM SIGNAL ZUR KOMPENSATION VON FREQUENZFEHLERN IN LTE-SIGNALEN | [2022/47] | English: | SYSTEM WITH MODULATED SIGNAL TO COMPENSATE FREQUENCY ERRORS IN LTE SIGNALS | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈME À SIGNAL MODULÉ PERMETTANT DE COMPENSER DES ERREURS DE FRÉQUENCE DANS DES SIGNAUX LTE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 15.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008056305 (MEDVEDEV IRINA [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0120] ** figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]EP2315366 (EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 5,14 *; | [XA]WO2016195813 (VIASAT INC [US]) [X] 9,13 * paragraph [0172] * * figure 39 * [A] 1-8,10-12,14-19 | by applicant | US9973266 |