EP3987664 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING CONTEXT MODELS FOR ENTROPY CODING OF TRANSFORM COEFFICIENT SIGNIFICANT FLAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUYEUNG, Cheung c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Xin c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LI, Xiang c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 04 /
LIU, Shan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20826974.6 | 18.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020US38417 | Priority number, date | US201962863742P | 19.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962863742 P | US202016904000 | 17.06.2020 Original published format: US202016904000 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020257447 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3987664 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/13, H04N19/18, H04N19/70, H04N19/91 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/60 (US);
H04N19/124 (KR,US);
H04N19/136 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (KR);
H04N19/91 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/167 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H03M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REDUKTION VON KONTEXTMODELLEN ZUR ENTROPIECODIERUNG EINES SIGNIFIKANTEN MERKERS EINES TRANSFORMATIONSKOEFFIZIENTEN | [2022/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING CONTEXT MODELS FOR ENTROPY CODING OF TRANSFORM COEFFICIENT SIGNIFICANT FLAG | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉDUCTION DE MODÈLES CONTEXTUELS POUR CODAGE ENTROPIQUE D'UN INDICATEUR SIGNIFICATIF DE COEFFICIENT DE TRANSFORMATION | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017064336 (ZHANG LI [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018149685 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) |