EP3905426 - BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING COOLING MEMBER AND BATTERY PACK AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Jae-Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
MUN, Jeong-O LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Eun-Gyu LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Yoon-Koo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
YOO, Jae-Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
MUN, Jeong-O Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
SHIN, Eun-Gyu Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Yoon-Koo Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/11] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2021/44] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20827285.6 | 27.05.2020 | [2021/44] | WO2020KR06861 | Priority number, date | KR20190071732 | 17.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190071732 | [2021/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020256303 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905426 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3905426 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/6557, H01M10/613, H01M50/35, H01M50/209, H01M50/507 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (KR);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/625 (US);
H01M10/627 (KR);
H01M10/6554 (KR);
H01M10/6555 (CN);
H01M10/6568 (CN,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR);
H01M50/244 (KR);
H01M50/251 (KR);
H01M50/258 (KR);
H01M50/271 (KR);
H01M50/308 (KR);
H01M50/325 (KR,US);
H01M50/3425 (KR);
H01M50/35 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/505 (KR,US);
H01M50/507 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2200/20 (KR);
H01M2220/10 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | H01M10/6556, H01M10/6554, H01M10/627, H01M10/613, H01M50/209, H01M50/35, H01M50/507 | ||
Former IPC [2021/44] | H01M10/6556, H01M10/6554, H01M2/12, H01M10/627, H01M10/613, H01M2/10, H01M2/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL MIT KÜHLELEMENT UND BATTERIEPACK UND ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/44] | English: | BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING COOLING MEMBER AND BATTERY PACK AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2021/44] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT, BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | Translation filed | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23170193.9 / EP4243188 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2068381 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [X]US2018175466 (SEO JEONG HUN [KR], et al); | [XI]WO2019028516 (CAPE BOUVARD TECH PTY LTD [AU]) | International search | [A]KR20120076756 (POSCO ICT CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20130033597 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP5183171B ; | [Y]KR20150142338 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180050206 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20190071732 |