EP3975525 - LASER PROJECTION MODULE, DEPTH CAMERA AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Fu No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20827534.7 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020CN96408 | Priority number, date | CN201920957166U | 21.06.2019 Original published format: CN 201920957166 U | [2022/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020253686 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975525 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3975525 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04N23/57 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H04M1/0264 (EP);
G01B11/22 (US);
G02B27/4205 (US);
G03B21/2033 (US);
H04N23/45 (EP);
H04N23/56 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | H04M1/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | LASERPROJEKTIONSMODUL, TIEFENKAMERA UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/13] | English: | LASER PROJECTION MODULE, DEPTH CAMERA AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/13] | French: | MODULE DE PROJECTION LASER, CAMÉRA DE PROFONDEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | Translation filed | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN108344374 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-13 *; | [I]CN108388063 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 1-54 * | International search | [A]US2011117958 (KIM TAE HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]CN107343062 (SHANGHAI YUDE TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0029], and figures 1-5 *; | [Y]CN107483663 (JIANGXI HOLITECH TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0037], and figures 1-7 *; | [Y]CN108513055 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [Y] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0003]-[0167], and figures 1-20 *; | [A]CN109067951 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN109167901 (CHONGQING TS PRECISION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]CN208739213U (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [Y] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0122], and figures 1-12 *; | [PX]CN210112060U (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * claims 1-16, description paragraphs [0002]-[0084], figures 1-13 * |