EP3986230 - ABSORBENT LINER, SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medivators Inc. 14605 28th Avenue North Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Mark Campfield Road Shoeburyness Essex SS3 9BX / GB | 02 /
KORTH, Joshua J. 14605 29th Avenue North Minneapolis, Minnesota 55447 / US | 03 /
SPENCER, Gary Campfield Road Shoeburyness Essex SS3 9BX / GB | 04 /
NICHOLS, Stephen Campfield Road Shoeburyness Essex SS3 9BX / GB | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20827614.7 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020US36630 | Priority number, date | US201962864115P | 20.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962864115 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020256989 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986230 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/12, A61B50/39, A61B50/33 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
A61B1/00144 (EP);
A61B50/39 (US);
A61B50/33 (US);
A61B90/70 (US);
A61L2/07 (US);
A61L2/206 (US);
A61L2/26 (US);
A61B2050/3006 (EP);
A61B2050/3014 (US);
A61B2050/314 (EP,US);
A61B2090/701 (US);
A61L2202/181 (US);
A61L2202/23 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | A61B1/00, A61B1/12, A61B50/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDE AUSKLEIDUNG, SYSTEME UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/17] | English: | ABSORBENT LINER, SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF USE | [2022/17] | French: | REVÊTEMENT ABSORBANT, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 14.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003078472 (PARKER GEORGE CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2007228080 (LIN SZU-MIN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2008251102 (HAACK SCOTT G [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0005] , [0034] , [0035] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0040] , [0055] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2011192744 (PARKER GEORGE CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0088] ** figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2017056122 (RAMSEY PETER [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0096] , [0108] , [0152] * * paragraphs [0157] , [0164] , [0179] , [0180] , [0181] , [0185] * * figures 1-8,16 *; | [Y]WO2018152400 (MEDIVATORS INC [US]) [Y] 5-14 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 2,6 * | International search | [Y]US6235692 (SCOVILLE JOHN R [US], et al) [Y] 25,32,43 * , col 3 In 13-21, col 5 In 21-24, col 5 In 66-67. *; | [Y]US2007228080 (LIN SZU-MIN [US], et al) [Y] 33,34,40* , figures 1-5, para [0007], [0023]-[0030]. *; | [XY]US2008251102 (HAACK SCOTT G [US], et al) [X] 42, 44 * , figures 1-5, para [0004], [0005], [0034]-[0040], [0055]. * [Y] 6-8, 15, 19/(6-8, 15), 43; | [Y]US2013010574 (FREIJSEN MARION [NL], et al) [Y] 18, 19/18, 28, 29 * , figures 1-3, para [0010], [0030], [0035], [0055]. *; | [XY]US2017056122 (RAMSEY PETER [GB]) [X] 1-5, 9-14, 16, 17, 19/(1-5, 9-14, 16, 17), 20-24, 26, 27, 30, 31 * , figures 1-25, para [0018]-[0019], [0024], [0096], [0100], [0108], [0112]-[0117], [0119], [0130], [0152], [0157], [0164]-[0169], [0179]-[0190], [0194], [0220], [0224], [0228]. * [Y] 6-8, 15, 18, 10/(6-8, 16, 18), 25, 28, 29, 32-40; | [Y]WO2018152400 (MEDIVATORS INC [US]) [Y] 33, 35-39 * , figures 1-6, para [0010], [0035], [0037], [0040], [0041]. * |