EP3988205 - STRUCTURED METAL-ORGANIC FRAMEWORK FIBER ADSORBENT FOR CAPTURING CARBON DIOXIDE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 291 Daehak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company P.O.Box 5000 Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOH, Dong Yeun 291, Daehak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Young Hun 291, Daehak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | 03 /
JAMAL, Aqil GC-320, Research and Development Center P.O. Box 6785 Dhahran, 31311 / SA | [2022/26] |
Former [2022/17] | 01 /
KOH, Dong Yeun 291, Daehak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Young Hun 291, Daehak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | |||
03 /
AQIL, Jamal GC-320, Research and Development Center P.O. Box 6785 Dhahran, 31311 / SA | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20827862.2 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020KR07939 | Priority number, date | KR20190073151 | 19.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190073151 | [2022/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020256450 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988205 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/30, B01J20/26, B01J20/22, B01J20/28, B01D53/02 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
B01J20/226 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J20/3085 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,CN);
B01J20/265 (CN);
B01J20/267 (KR,US);
B01J20/28023 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J20/28026 (KR);
B01J20/28028 (EP);
B01J20/28042 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3064 (US);
B01D2253/204 (EP);
B01D2253/342 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | B01J20/30, B01J20/26, B01J20/22, B01J20/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | FASERADSORBENS MIT STRUKTURIERTEM METALLORGANISCHEM GERÜST ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/17] | English: | STRUCTURED METAL-ORGANIC FRAMEWORK FIBER ADSORBENT FOR CAPTURING CARBON DIOXIDE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/17] | French: | ADSORBANT EN FIBRES À RÉSEAU ORGANOMÉTALLIQUE STRUCTURÉ POUR LA CAPTURE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2022 | Translation filed | 06.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009003174 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US], et al) [X] 11,14 * claim 16 * * figures 1A-B,2A-B * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 4 ** page 16, line 18 - page 18, line 3 *; | [X]WO2018126194 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [X] 11 * claims 1,14 *; | [X]WO2019099086 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [X] 11 * claim 22 * * figures 9,10 *; | [X] - BIAN YE ET AL, "Metal-organic framework-based nanofiber filters for effective indoor air quality control", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY A, GB, (20180101), vol. 6, no. 32, doi:10.1039/C8TA04539A, ISSN 2050-7488, pages 15807 - 15814, XP093061465 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * 2: Experimental, 2.1 Electrospinning solution preparation, 2.2. Electrospun fiber preparation, 2.3. Incorporation of ZIF-67 into the electrospun PAN fiber; page 15808, column r * * 3. Results and discussion; page 15809, column l * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C8TA04539A | [X] - Bian Ye ET AL, "Supporting Information : Metal-Organic Framework-Based Nanofiber Filters for Effective Indoor Air Quality Control", Journal of Material Chemistry A, (20180720), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://www.rsc.org/suppdata/c8/ta/c8ta04539a/c8ta04539a1.pdf, (20230706), XP093061592 [X] 1-12 * figure S3 * | [X] - PIMENTEL BRIAN R. ET AL, "Synthesis of Water-Sensitive Metal-Organic Frameworks within Fiber Sorbent Modules", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (20170420), vol. 56, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acs.iecr.7b00630, ISSN 0888-5885, pages 5070 - 5077, XP093061461 [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * 1. Introduction; page 5071, column l * * 2. Materials and Methods; page 5071 - page 5072 * * tables 1,2 * * Scheme 1 * * 2.6. CO2/N2 Breakthrough Analysis. Sorbent Module preparation; page 5073, column l * * 3. Results and Discussion; page 5074, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.iecr.7b00630 | [X] - Pimentel Brian R. ET AL, "Supporting Information Controlled Synthesis of Metal-Organic Frameworks in Scalable Open-Porous Contactor for Maximizing Carbon Capture Efficiency", Industrial & Engineering Chemistry Research, (20170410), pages 1 - 19, URL: https://doi.org/10.1021/acs.iecr.7b00630, (20230705), XP093061462 [X] 1-15 * page 12 - page 16 * * figures S6-S10 * | International search | [A]KR20080021037 (BASF SE [DE]) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20120021734 (AMOMEDI CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20170119829 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20180117023 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [Y] 4,8-9,11,16,20 * See claims 1 and 5. *; | [YX]KR20190050109 (UNIV SOOKMYUNG WOMENS IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]) [Y] 4,8-9,11,16,20 * See paragraphs [0040] and [0054]; and claims 1-3 and 5-7. * [X] 1-3,5-7,10,12-15,17-19 | by applicant | KR20180043936 | KR20180117023 |