EP4072363 - POWER LEVEL INDICATION IN A DEVICE FOR AN ELECTRONIC AEROSOL PROVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, David Alan c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Whiting, Gary, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20828076.8 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020GB53168 | Priority number, date | GB20190018091 | 10.12.2019 Original published format: GB 201918091 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021116687 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072363 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4072363 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/60, A24F40/50 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A24F40/60 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/10 (US);
A24F40/51 (KR);
A24F40/53 (KR);
H01M2220/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTUFENANZEIGE IN EINER VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES AEROSOLBEREITSTELLUNGSYSTEM | [2022/42] | English: | POWER LEVEL INDICATION IN A DEVICE FOR AN ELECTRONIC AEROSOL PROVISION SYSTEM | [2022/42] | French: | INDICATION DE NIVEAU DE PUISSANCE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À UN SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'AÉROSOL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 21.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | LU | 10.12.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011265806 (ALARCON RAMON [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0056]; figure 1A *; | [XA]US2014270727 (AMPOLINI FREDERIC PHILIPPE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-19 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0096] , [0097] , [0130] , [0131] , [0132]; figures 1,6 * [A] 4-6; | [A]US2014278250 (SMITH BARRY S [US], et al) [A] 1-19* paragraph [0029]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2015272223 (WEIGENSBERG AARON ARYE [IL], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0048] - [0061]; figure 2 * |