EP4076566 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR A CASSETTE CAPTURE MECHANISM FOR PHACOEMULSIFICATION SURGICAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Surgical Vision, Inc. 31 Technology Drive, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEEREN, Tammo 76 Southwind Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | 02 /
DUNNE, John C. 2215 Canyon Drive Apt. C Costa Mesa, California 92627 / US | 03 /
FLOWERS, Matthew 25 Destiny Way Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20828328.3 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020IB61973 | Priority number, date | US201962949432P | 17.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962949432 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021124107 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076566 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61M3/0201 (EP);
A61F9/00745 (US);
A61F9/00736 (EP);
A61M1/72 (EP);
A61M1/74 (EP);
A61M1/77 (EP);
A61M3/0202 (EP);
A61M3/0208 (EP);
A61M3/0212 (EP);
A61M3/0216 (EP);
A61M3/022 (EP);
A61M3/0258 (EP);
A61B2217/005 (US);
A61B2217/007 (US);
A61M1/60 (EP);
A61M2205/121 (EP,US);
A61M2205/122 (US);
A61M2205/123 (EP);
A61M2205/128 (EP);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3389 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN KASSETTENFANGMECHANISMUS FÜR CHIRURGISCHE PHAKOEMULSIFIKATIONSANWENDUNGEN | [2022/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR A CASSETTE CAPTURE MECHANISM FOR PHACOEMULSIFICATION SURGICAL APPLICATIONS | [2022/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UN MÉCANISME DE CAPTURE DE CASSETTE POUR DES APPLICATIONS CHIRURGICALES DE PHACOÉMULSIFICATION | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 15.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1839690 (ALCON INC [CH]) [I] 1-10,19-24 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 8] - [0013]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2014178215 (BAXTER VINCENT A [US], et al) [A] 1-10,19-24* paragraphs [0062] - [0066]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US2010249693 | US8491528 |