EP4065753 - MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR CO X REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Twelve Benefit Corporation 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOU, Ziyang 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 02 /
WANG, Lihui 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 03 /
HUA, Kenneth X. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 04 /
MA, Sichao 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 05 /
IZETT, Edward 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 06 /
HUNEGNAW, Sara 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 07 /
KASHI, Ajay R. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 08 /
CAVE, Etosha R. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94710-2224 / US | 09 /
KUHL, Kendra P. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | 10 /
GOLDMAN, Maxwell 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | 11 /
REYES, Angelica L. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | 12 /
CORP, Kathryn L. 614 Bancroft Way, B Berkeley, California 94704-2224 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Higgs, Jonathan Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Higgs, Jonathan Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20828439.8 | 24.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020US62080 | Priority number, date | US201962939960P | 25.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962939960 P | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021108446 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065753 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, C25B3/03, C25B3/26, C25B9/23, C25B13/02, C25B13/08, B01D61/44 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
C25B1/04 (EP);
C25B9/23 (EP,KR,US);
C08F293/00 (US);
C08J5/2218 (EP,KR);
C25B1/02 (KR);
C25B1/23 (KR,US);
C25B13/02 (EP,KR,US);
C25B13/08 (EP,KR,US);
C25B3/03 (EP,KR);
C25B3/07 (KR);
C25B3/26 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/36 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | <SUP2/>? <SUB2/>?X?MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG FÜR CO-REDUKTION | [2022/40] | English: | MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR CO X REDUCTION | [2022/40] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE MEMBRANE-ÉLECTRODES POUR LA RÉDUCTION DE CO X | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH06145379 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 17-20 * the whole document *[I] 21-29; | [XDAI]US2017321334 (KUHL KENDRA P [US], et al) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [A] 10-16 [I] 6-9; | [XAI]US2019134570 (PINTAURO PETER N [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 10-16 [I] 2-4 | by applicant | US2017321334 | US2019226103 | - PHAN et al., "Role of Capping Agent in Wet Synthesis of Nanoparticles", J. Phys. Chem. A, (20180000), vol. 121, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acs.jpca.7b02186, pages 3213 - 3219, XP055680320 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jpca.7b02186 | - BAKSHI, "How Surfactants Control Crystal Growth of Nanomaterials", Cryst. Growth Des., (20160000), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 1104 - 1133 | - MORSY, "Role of Surfactants in Nanotechnology and Their Applications", Int. J. Curr. Microbiol. App. Sci., (20140000), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 237 - 260, XP055612998 |