EP4073354 - PRESSURISING OF LUBRICATION CHAMBERS IN A TURBOMACHINE WITH COUNTER-ROTATING TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVISSE, Paul Ghislain Albert Safran c/o Centre d'excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
BELMONTE, Olivier Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
CATY, Fabien Roger Gaston Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
CHASSAGNE, Amélie Argie Antoinette Safran c/o Centre d'Excellence Propriété Intellectuelle Rond-point René Ravaud, Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20828663.3 | 01.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020FR52230 | Priority number, date | FR20190014017 | 10.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1914017 | [2022/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021116556 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073354 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4073354 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/02, F01D25/18, F02C3/067, F02C7/06, F02C7/28, F02C7/36, F02K3/06 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
F02K3/06 (EP);
F01D1/24 (US);
F01D11/005 (US);
F01D11/02 (EP);
F01D25/00 (US);
F01D25/183 (EP);
F02C3/067 (EP);
F02C7/06 (EP);
F02C7/28 (EP);
F02C7/36 (EP);
F05D2260/40311 (EP,US);
F05D2260/98 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERDRUCKSETZUNG VON SCHMIERKAMMERN IN EINER TURBOMASCHINE MIT GEGENLÄUFIGER TURBINE | [2022/42] | English: | PRESSURISING OF LUBRICATION CHAMBERS IN A TURBOMACHINE WITH COUNTER-ROTATING TURBINE | [2022/42] | French: | PRESSURISATION D'ENCEINTES DE LUBRIFICATION DANS UNE TURBOMACHINE A TURBINE CONTRAROTATIVE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 10.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 01.12.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2820280 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]WO2017158296 (SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES [FR]); | [A]US2018223732 (CLEMENTS JEFFREY DONALD [US], et al); | [A]US2019085701 (PANKAJ PEEYUSH [IN], et al) | by applicant | EP2820280 | WO2017158296 | US2018223732 | US2019085701 |