EP4076856 - ELECTROMECHANICALLY OPERATED TOOL FOR DRIVING IN FASTENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovation Network Austria Dienstleistungs- GmbH Am Ottstorfer Berg 50 4600 Thalheim bei Wels / AT | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Rohrmoser, Florian Schiedweg 39 5611 Großarl / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohrmoser, Florian 5611 Großarl / AT | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/43] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20828828.2 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020AT60469 | Priority number, date | AT20190051105 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: AT 511052019 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119702 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076856 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4076856 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/06 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B25C1/06 (EP,AT);
B25C5/15 (US);
B25C5/1617 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH-MECHANISCH BETRIEBENES WERKZEUG ZUM EINTREIBEN VON BEFESTIGUNGSMITTELN | [2022/43] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICALLY OPERATED TOOL FOR DRIVING IN FASTENERS | [2022/43] | French: | OUTIL À COMMANDE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE POUR ENTRAÎNER DES ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 14.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1935572 (HILTI AG [LI]) [AD] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2397269 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2397260 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0040] ** figure - * | by applicant | EP1935572 | EP2397269 |