EP4172544 - STEAM CONDENSER WITH HEAT EXCHANGER AND A COOKING OVEN WITH SUCH STEAM CONDENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Retech Spólka Z Ograniczona Opdowiedzialnoscia ul.Wojska Polskiego 6A 39-300 Mielec / PL | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIARKO, Andrzej 39-300 Mielec / PL | 02 /
ZIARKO, Boguslaw 82418 Murnau / DE | 03 /
ZIARKO, Krzysztof 39-300 Mielec / PL | [2024/18] |
Former [2023/18] | 01 /
ZIARKO, Andrzej 39-300 39-300 Mielec / PL | ||
02 /
ZIARKO, Bogus aw 82418 82418 Murnau / DE | |||
03 /
ZIARKO, Krzysztof 39-300 39-300 Mielec / PL | Representative(s) | AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o. ul. Rondo Ignacego Daszynskiego 1 00-843 Warsaw / PL | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 20829381.1 | 26.10.2020 | [2023/18] | WO2020PL50076 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022093052 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4172544 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4172544 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F28B1/06, F28B9/08, F28F9/26, F28F9/06, F28F17/00, F24C15/20, F28F1/24 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
F28B1/06 (EP);
F28F1/24 (EP,US);
A47J27/04 (US);
F24C15/2042 (EP);
F28B9/08 (EP);
F28D21/0014 (EP);
F28D7/085 (EP);
F28F17/005 (EP,US);
F28F9/06 (EP);
F28F9/26 (EP);
A47J2027/043 (US);
F28F2215/00 (US);
F28F2230/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFKONDENSATOR MIT WÄRMETAUSCHER UND BACKOFEN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN DAMPFKONDENSATOR | [2023/18] | English: | STEAM CONDENSER WITH HEAT EXCHANGER AND A COOKING OVEN WITH SUCH STEAM CONDENSER | [2023/18] | French: | CONDENSEUR DE VAPEUR AVEC ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET FOUR DE CUISSON AVEC UN TEL CONDENSEUR DE VAPEUR | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 25.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5301652 (WILLIS THOMAS J [US], et al); | [AD]CN210014672U (TAICANG RUIPU PREC MACHINERY CO LTD) | by applicant | US9557082 | CN210014672U |