EP4069842 - THERAPEUTIC EDITING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shape Therapeutics Inc. 700 Dexter Avenue N, Suite 1550 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Shape Therapeutics Inc. 500 Yale Avenue N Seattle, WA 98109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSS, David 75 Vine Street Unit 807 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | 02 /
MALI, Prashant 11351 Alvarez Meadow Court San Diego, California 92126 / US | 03 /
LAKSHMANAN, Anupama 4129 248th Court SE Sammamish, Washington 98029 / US | 04 /
NYE, Christopher 435 SW Forrest Place Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | 05 /
SAVVA, Yiannis 1212 Harrison Street W-701 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 06 /
STEIN, Liana 15901 71st Ave NE Kenmore, Washington 98028 / US | 07 /
SULLIVAN, Richard 9055 Palatine Avenue N Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | 08 /
PONCE, Rafael 3818 Corliss Ave N Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | 09 /
BYRNE, Susan c/o Shape Therapeutics Inc. 219 Terry Avenue, N Suite 100 Seattle, Washington, 98109 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20829429.8 | 01.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020US62756 | Priority number, date | US201962942693P | 02.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962942693 P | US201962942667P | 02.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962942667 P | US201962942683P | 02.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962942683 P | US202063022727P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022727 P | US202063030165P | 26.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063030165 P | US202063112286P | 11.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063112286 P | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021113270 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069842 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61P25/28 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP);
C12N15/11 (US);
A61K48/0066 (US);
A61P25/28 (US);
C07K14/47 (US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N9/78 (US);
C12Y305/04004 (US);
C12N2310/11 (EP);
C12N2310/122 (US);
C12N2310/333 (US);
C12N2310/334 (US);
C12N2310/336 (US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US);
C12N2310/533 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHES EDITIEREN | [2022/41] | English: | THERAPEUTIC EDITING | [2022/41] | French: | ÉDITION THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 30.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2016094845 (WOOLF TOD M [US], et al); | [A]WO2016097212 (PROQR THERAPEUTICS II BV [NL]); | [A]WO2017220751 (PROQR THERAPEUTICS II BV [NL]); | [XAI]WO2019071048 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2019158475 (PROQR THERAPEUTICS II BV [NL]); | [IA]WO2019162692 (ROYAL HOLLOWAY & BEDFORD NEW COLLEGE [GB]); | [XPAI]WO2020124257 (TREMBLAY JACQUES P [CA], et al); |