EP4077207 - ON-CHIP SIGNAL PATH WITH ELECTRICAL AND PHYSICAL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InvenSense, Inc. 1745 Technology Drive Suite 200 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTWELL, Peter George c/o 1745 Technology Drive, Suite 200 San Jose, California 95110 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20829456.1 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US63443 | Priority number, date | US201916717660 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: US201916717660 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126563 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077207 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B81B7/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B81B7/007 (EP,US);
B81B2207/098 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | ON-CHIP-SIGNALWEG MIT ELEKTRISCHER UND PHYSIKALISCHER VERBINDUNG | [2022/43] | English: | ON-CHIP SIGNAL PATH WITH ELECTRICAL AND PHYSICAL CONNECTION | [2022/43] | French: | TRAJET DE SIGNAL SUR PUCE À RACCORDEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE ET PHYSIQUE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 30.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE102007058951 (EPCOS AG [DE]) [X] 16-20 * paragraphs [0004] , [0054] , [0069] , [0080] * * claim 3 * * figures 7A-7K,9 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2016016789 (YU SHAO-CHI [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] ** figures 2A,9B * |