EP4065615 - ETHYLENE-BASED POLYMER COMPOSITION WITH BRANCHING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2211 H.H. Dow Way Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRASOVSKIY, Arkady L. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
KONSTANTINOV, Ivan A. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | 03 /
MUNJAL, Sarat 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | 04 /
EWART, Sean W. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20829732.5 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020US60025 | Priority number, date | US201962940649P | 26.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962940649 P | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021108134 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065615 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/02, C08F10/02, C08F110/02, C08F210/02, C08F290/04, C08L23/04 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F290/062 (US);
C08F110/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/00 (KR);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F210/02 (EP,KR);
C08F236/22 (KR);
C08F290/122 (EP,KR);
C08F4/38 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F110/02, C08F2/00 (EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2/38 (EP);
C08F210/02, C08F236/22, C08F2500/11, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/29 (EP);
C08F210/02, C08F4/38 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | ETHYLENBASIERTE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERZWEIGUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/40] | English: | ETHYLENE-BASED POLYMER COMPOSITION WITH BRANCHING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2022/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE À BASE D'ÉTHYLÈNE AVEC RAMIFICATION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 27.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP2499175 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [I] 1-15 * polyunsaturated co-monomer; paragraph [0056] * * polyunsaturated co-monomer;; paragraph [0064] * * ldpe - polymerization process; paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0093] ** melt flow; 0,2-10g/min; paragraph [0071] *; | [A]WO2018223045 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * markush formula additiv - two terminal double bonds; page 2, line 20 - line 29 *; | [XP]WO2020112873 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * melt index; paragraph [0069] * * claim - * * tubular reactor - claim 15; paragraph [0111] * | by applicant | WO2013059042 | WO2013078018 | - WILLIAMSWARD, J. Polym. Sci., Polym. Let., (19680000), vol. 6, page 621 | - ZIMM, B.H., J. Chem. Phys., (19480000), vol. 16, page 1099 | - YAU, WALLACE W., "Examples of Using 3D-GPC-TREF for Polyolefin Characterization", Macromol. Symp., (20070000), vol. 257, pages 29 - 45 |