EP4045744 - FITTING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/34] | FITTING ASSEMBLY | ||
[2023/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MACO Technologie GmbH Alpenstrasse 173 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEGER, Wolfgang Prötschhofstrasse 7 5082 Grödig / AT | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20829846.3 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020EP85967 | Priority number, date | DE201910134407 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019134407 | [2022/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021116490 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045744 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4045744 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/02, E05D5/02, E05D7/02, E05D15/52, E05D7/12 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
E05D15/5205 (EP);
E05D3/02 (EP);
E05D5/0215 (EP);
E05D7/02 (EP);
E05D2007/128 (EP);
E05Y2201/48 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHLAGANORDNUNG | [2022/34] | English: | FITTING ARRANGEMENT | [2023/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE FERRURE | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/34] | FITTING ASSEMBLY | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | MC | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | LU | 14.12.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
DK | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1923282U (BILSTEIN HANS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3024746 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]DE4040233 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 8; figures 6,7 * [I] 7,8; | [A]DE4109636 (FUHR CARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202004019551U (ROTO FRANK AG [DE]) [A] 9* paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figures 5,6 * | Examination | DE4040233 |