EP4035422 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING SYSTEM AND HEARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/31] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING SYSTEM, AND HEARING SYSTEM | ||
[2022/33] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNEMANN, Ronny 91054 Buckenhof / DE | 02 /
WURZBACHER, Tobias 90768 Fürth / DE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20830158.0 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP86518 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022128082 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4035422 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H04R25/505 (EP);
G08B21/0446 (EP,US);
A61B5/1117 (EP);
A61B5/1126 (US);
A61B5/6803 (EP);
A61B5/6815 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
G08B21/043 (EP);
G08B31/00 (US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
G08B29/188 (EP);
H04R2225/39 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES HÖRSYSTEMS UND HÖRSYSTEM | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING SYSTEM AND HEARING SYSTEM | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME AUDITIF ET SYSTÈME AUDITIF | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/31] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING SYSTEM, AND HEARING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/31] | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME AUDITIF, ET SYSTÈME AUDITIF | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 11.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2018228404 (BHUNIA SOURAV K [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 8,9; | [YA]WO2020124022 (STARKEY LABS INC [US]) [Y] 7 * page 22, line 23 - page 24, line 3 * * page 25, line 26 - page 29, line 20 * * page 30, line 3 - page 34, line 14 * * page 38, line 29 - page 47, line 15 * * figures 3,8,9,12,17-20 *[A] 8,10; | [XI]US2020205746 (BURWINKEL JUSTIN R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 8,9; | [XYI]WO2020206155 (STARKEY LABS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 7 [I] 8,9 | by applicant | - TINETTI ME, "Performance-oriented assessment of mobility problems in elderly patients", J Am Geriatr Soc, (19860000), vol. 34, pages 119 - 126 |